CT HB05168 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Office of Policy and Management to develop and provide a form for (A) filing certain tax exemption applications, and (B) making determinations on such applications, (2) specify that payments made by federal, state or local governments for the treatment, support or care of certain individuals shall not constitute housing subsidies for the purposes of determining what is a charitable purpose, (3) require assessors to state the rationale for the denial of a property tax exemption for charitable purposes on their records, and (4) authorize owners of certain property to apply for relief from the Superior Court in the event that such an exemption is wrongfully denied by assessors.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Tax Exemptions For Property Used For Charitable Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 355 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 35 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 48 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 35 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 48 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-73 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-18 | House | File Number 511 |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 368 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4582 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4557 |
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 177 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 150 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |