CT HB05167 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Senate Calendar Number 273
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Senate Calendar Number 273
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the amount of unexpended funds that a board of education is allowed to deposit into a nonlapsing account at the end of the fiscal year.
Title
An Act Increasing The Amount A Town May Deposit Into A Nonlapsing Account For Unexpended Education Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | File Number 121 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 99 |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |