CT HB05165 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) amend the process timeline for the revision and adoption of the state plan of conservation and development, and (2) extend to 2025 the application of the plan intended to cover 2018 to 2023, inclusive.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Plan Of Conservation And Development.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 373 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-71 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 63 |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended |
2022-03-14 | House | File Number 7 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 41 |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |