CT HB05165 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require youth camps to conduct background checks of prospective employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Background Checks For Prospective Youth Camp Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 112
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 90
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-03-05HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-21HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback