CT HB05164 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 549
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 549
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a residential vertical platform lift technician's license.
Title
An Act Concerning Installers Of Residential Vertical Platform Lifts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 268 (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 549 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-02 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | File Number 375 |
2021-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 288 |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2021-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |