CT HB05161 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) increase State Historic Preservation Review Board members' terms from one year to three years; (2) decrease the notice period required for notification of a municipal preservation board or a municipality's chief executive officer that a property is nominated to the National Register of Historic Places from sixty days to thirty days; (3) eliminate the requirement that the State Historic Preservation Officer attend municipal hearings regarding nominations to the National Register of Historic Places; and (4) change the board's name from the State Historic Preservation Board to the State Historic Preservation Review Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The Members And Duties Of The State Historic Preservation Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |