CT HB05159 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Public Hearing 03/05
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Public Hearing 03/05
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a tax credit for employers of instructors in advanced manufacturing certificate programs at regional community-technical colleges.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Employers Of Instructors In Advanced Manufacturing Certificate Programs At Regional Community-technical Colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2020-02-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Vote to Draft |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |