CT HB05158 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure food allergy awareness in the restaurant industry.
Title
An Act Requiring Food Allergy Training In Restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 350 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 224 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |