CT HB05154 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - File Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - File Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) police officers to maintain in such officers' vehicles copies of documents concerning behavioral and mental health evaluation and treatment resources available to children and services and resources available to victims of domestic violence, and distribute such copies at such officers' discretion, and (2) the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council and Department of Education to provide such documents to the Division of State Police and municipal police departments.
Title
An Act Requiring The Provision Of Information Concerning Children's Mental Health And Domestic Violence By Police Officers And Emergency Medical Technicians.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Mary Welander [D] | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] |
Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 60 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 89 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |