CT HB05152 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 885
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require a study of marijuana-impaired driving and methods of detecting if a person's driving is impaired by marijuana usage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Study Of Marijuana-impaired Driving And Methods To Detect Marijuana-impaired Driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 885
2019-05-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseNew File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 387
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 240
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback