CT HB05150 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding revisions to the general statutes concerning municipal health authorities and district departments of health.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Revisions To The General Statutes Concerning Municipal Health Authorities And District Departments Of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 305 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |