CT HB05149 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - File Number 759
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - File Number 759
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To identify a beneficial end use for discarded tires and evaluate tire hauling licenses as a means to prevent the illegal disposal of tires.
Title
An Act Concerning Recycling At Municipal Ballfields.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 164 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | File Number 759 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 540 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5334 |
2016-03-10 | House | File Number 23 |
2016-03-10 | House | House Calendar Number 55 |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |