CT HB05148 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - File Number 643
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - File Number 643
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that any person who advertises commercial kennel services shall be required to include their license number in such advertisement.
Title
An Act Making Minor Revisions To The Provisions Of The General Statutes Regarding Commercial Kennel Services Advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 643 |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 380 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-12 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3788 |
2016-03-10 | House | File Number 22 |
2016-03-10 | House | House Calendar Number 54 |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |