CT HB05145 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the use of portable wastewater holding tanks, known as "blue boys", for transferring wastewater from a camping unit to a sanitary disposal station at both state and private campgrounds.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Portable Wastewater Containers.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. John Piscopo [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 22-52 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 492 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 35 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 74 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |