CT HB05143 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To lower the age an elderly person must be to obtain available property tax relief.
Title
An Act Lowering The Age Of Eligibility For Property Tax Relief For Elderly Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |