CT HB05138 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to conduct a study regarding the obstacles to merging or consolidating the fire districts or fire departments of two or more municipalities.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of The Obstacles To Merging Or Consolidating Municipal Fire Districts And Fire Departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |