CT HB05137 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate a requirement that the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management withhold or reduce state financial assistance provided to municipalities whose residents received grant payments under the renters rebate program.
Title
An Act Eliminating Reductions Of State Financial Assistance To Municipalities Whose Residents Received Grant Payments Under The Renters Rebate Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 52 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 66 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2018-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |