CT HB05136 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require public institutions of higher education to assess and address homelessness and housing insecurity among students.
Title
An Act Addressing The Needs Of Housing-insecure Students At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | House | File Number 16 |
2022-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 47 |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |