CT HB05133 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the use of the Penfield Reef lighthouse as a columbarium.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of The Penfield Reef Lighthouse As A Columbarium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |