CT HB05132 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) restructure the Zoning Enabling Act for clarity, (2) promote the purposes of the federal Fair Housing Act, (3) provide an administrative mechanism to promote compliance with municipal affordable housing plans, and (4) require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to convene a working group to study municipal affordable housing plans and zoning regulations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Reorganization Of The Zoning Enabling Act And The Promotion Of Municipal Compliance.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D] | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |