CT HB05130 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To transfer responsibility for inspections of privately owned dams from the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to the dam owners and to require owners of high and significant hazard dams to adopt emergency action plans.
Title
An Act Concerning The Dam Safety Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 292 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 545 | |
2012-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5462 | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 381 | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 291 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |