CT HB05127 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To impose additional requirements concerning the content of the state's consolidated plan for housing and community development and annual action plans.
Title
An Act Concerning The State's Long-term And Short-term Planning Concerning Housing Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2020-03-09 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2020-03-05 | House | Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |