CT HB05125 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require housing authorities administering a housing voucher program to post the maximum allowable rental rate for units on their Internet web sites and submit such rates to the 2-1-1 Infoline program for posting on its Internet web site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Transparency Of Rental Rates For Tenants Receiving Rental Assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-05HouseJoint Favorable
2020-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/18
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback