CT HB05119 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - File Number 99
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - File Number 99
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit pharmacists to administer the influenza vaccine to children twelve years of age and older with the consent of a parent or guardian.
Title
An Act Permitting Pharmacists To Administer The Influenza Vaccine To Children Twelve Years Of Age And Older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | File Number 99 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 102 |
2022-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |