CT HB05115 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Comptroller to fund the unfunded pension liability portion of the fringe benefit cost for employees of the constituent units of the state system of higher education.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unfunded Pension Liability Portion Of The Fringe Benefit Cost For Employees Of The Constituent Units Of The State System Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |