CT HB05114 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require training of each board member responsible for governing any institution of higher education in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring Training For The Members Of The Governing Boards Of The Institutions Of Higher Education In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |