CT HB05108 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require public institutions of higher education in the state to adopt a policy on freedom of expression on campus.
Title
An Act Requiring Public Institutions Of Higher Education To Establish A Policy Regarding Freedom Of Expression On Campus.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. Mike France [R] | Rep. Terrie Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | File Number 329 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 245 |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2021-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |