CT HB05106 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Public Hearing 02/19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Public Hearing 02/19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the state's overall Medicaid costs. .
Title
An Act Concerning Charges For Patient Care By Nursing Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-01-28 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services |
2013-01-25 | House | Change of Reference Human Services |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05106&which_year=2013 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2013/TOB/H/2013HB-05106-R00-HB.htm |