CT HB05105 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) include chicken eggs as part of the state-funded Connecticut Farmers' Market/WIC and Senior Nutrition programs, (2) increase fines for violating certain farm product grading and marketing requirements, and (3) provide the Commissioner of Agriculture with infraction authority for the violation of statutes under the commissioner's authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Revisions To The Connecticut-grown Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-02-28HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2020-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback