CT HB05103 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To strengthen the requirements under the state's environmental justice law.
Title
An Act Requiring An Evaluation Of The State's Environmental Justice Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |