CT HB05050 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Modernizing The Symbol Of Access For Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | House | Public Act 16-78 |
2016-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 600 |
2016-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 335 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 229 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |