CT HB05047 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - File Number 139
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - File Number 139
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow bank customers to cure an insufficient account balance before they are charged an overdraft fee.
Title
An Act Concerning Negative Account Balances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | File Number 139 | |
2010-03-25 | House Calendar Number 90 | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |