CT HB05046 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Promoting Nursing Home Resident Quality Of Life.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-141 |
2024-05-08 | House | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 461 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5571 |
2024-04-25 | House | File Number 611 |
2024-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-25 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-27 | House | File Number 146 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 121 |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |