CT HB05043 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Reforming Motor Vehicle Assessment.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | File Number 596 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 458 |
2022-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |