CT HB05041 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Public Hearing 03/25
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Public Hearing 03/25
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that major parties are not required to hold endorsing conventions and instead may only conduct primaries to nominate candidates for certain elective offices.
Title
An Act Concerning Major Party Conventions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Petition Number 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Petition to Draft Pursuant to Joint Rule 11 02/20 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |