CT HB05034 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - File Number 13
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - File Number 13
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an institution of higher education from considering legacy preferences in the admissions process.
Title
An Act Prohibiting An Institution Of Higher Education From Considering Legacy Preferences In The Admissions Process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | File Number 13 |
2022-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 44 |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |