CT HB05033 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase prison wages and benefits so that incarcerated individuals can fund their potential reentry into the community.
Title
An Act Concerning Compensation Of Incarcerated Individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | File Number 261 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2023-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |