CT HB05009 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 527
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 527
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt car wash services from the sales tax.
Title
An Act Exempting Car Wash Services From The Sales Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | File Number 527 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 353 |
2018-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-04-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2018-02-21 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |