CT HB05002 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the procurement of energy derived from anaerobic digestion and to require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to study the return on investment from fully implementing certain provisions of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning A Green Economy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 PASS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 216 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 216 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | House | Public Act 19-35 |
2019-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | File Number 1013 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 631 |
2019-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9844 |
2019-05-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 385 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 238 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |