CT HB05001 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the qualifying income threshold for the pension and annuity income deduction for married individuals filing jointly, to twice the amount of the qualifying income threshold for unmarried individuals.
Title
An Act Increasing The Qualifying Income Threshold For The Pension And Annuity Income Deduction For Married Individuals Filing Jointly.
Sponsors
House Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Jason Doucette [D] | Rep. Brandon Chafee [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |