CT HB05001 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to study workforce training needs in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Workforce Training Needs In The State.

Sponsors

House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee CommitteeRep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]
Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]
Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]
Rep. Joshua Hall [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]
Rep. Linda Orange [D]Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]
Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]
Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Patrick Boyd [D]
Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]
Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Christopher Ziogas [D]Sen. John Kissel [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 170
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 120
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback