CO SR005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of February 4, 2021, as "Missing Persons Day" in Colorado.
Title
Missing Persons Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |