CO SR005 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Summary
Armenian Genocide Resolution
Title
Armenian Genocide Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/77650379EB2F1C1687257B5D0077A54C?Open |