CO SJR025 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rename Brighton Ped Overpass For Arreda Hamilton
Title
Rename Brighton Ped Overpass For Arreda Hamilton
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |