CO SJR024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cesar Chavez Day
Title
Cesar Chavez Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/31/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |