CO SJR023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Summary
Teacher Day Resolution
Title
Teacher Day Resolution
Sponsors
Sen. Evie Hudak [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 12-023 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 12-023 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 12-023 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |