CO SJR022 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Colorado Mountain College's 50 years of service and education to the state of Colorado, and, in connection therewith, recognizing the notable achievements and contributions of the College and its graduates.
Title
Colorado Mountain College
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |