CO SJR021 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of a portion of Colorado Highway 44 as the "Deputy Gumm Memorial Highway".
Title
Deputy Gumm Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |