CO SJR019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of a portion of United States Highway 138 as the "Jack Annan "Mr. NJC" Memorial Highway".
Title
Jack Annan "Mr. NJC" Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer SJR21-019 to the Full House with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer SJR21-019 to the Full House with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |