CO SJR016 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the installation of a sculpture and explanatory plaque to memorialize the victims of the Sand Creek Massacre of November 29, 1864, on the State Capitol grounds.
Title
Approval Of Sand Creek Massacre Memorial Donation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |